This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 00:49:47 (UTC).

ROB ARROYO VS MOTION THEORY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/30/2017 ROB ARROYO filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against MOTION THEORY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0795

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROB ARROYO

Defendant

MOTION THEORY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Assignee

LABOR COMMISSIONER'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

Assignment of Judgment

3/15/2018: Assignment of Judgment

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Judgment

8/30/2017: Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2018
  • Assignment of Judgment; Filed by: Labor Commissioner's Office (Assignee); As to: Rob Arroyo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Case assigned to in ROOM 118 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rob Arroyo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Rob Arroyo against Defendant Motion theory, Inc., a California Corporation on the Complaint filed by Rob Arroyo on 08/30/2017 for the principal amount of $1,514.40, interest of $0.00, and costs of $250.00 for a total of $1,764.40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Motion Theory Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where LABOR COMMISSIONER'S OFFICE is a litigant