This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2019 at 07:29:07 (UTC).

RIVERA SANATARIUM INC VS STATE DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Case Summary

On 01/08/2016 RIVERA SANATARIUM INC filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against STATE DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0234

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RIVERA SANATARIUM INC

RIVERA SANATARIUM INC DBA COLONIAL GARDENS NURSING HOME

Defendant

STATE DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF HOLLY L JOHNSON INC

Defendant Attorney

KAMALA D HARRIS ATTORNEY GENERAL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 07/10/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - DECLARATORY RELIELF Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • DocketOSC SET 01/08/19, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIVERA SANATARIUM INC DBA COLONIAL GARDENS NURSING HOME is a litigant

Latest cases where State Department of Public Health is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAMALA D. HARRIS ATTORNEY GENERAL