This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2020 at 01:20:00 (UTC).

RICKY HINTON VS NORMA PROCTOR

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 RICKY HINTON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NORMA PROCTOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4366

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HINTON RICKY

Defendant

PROCTOR NORMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEAGER KENNETH CHARLES

Defendant Attorney

MCCLENDON NYKEEMAH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

9/17/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")) of 08/13/2020

8/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")) of 08/13/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

8/13/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF RICKY HINTONS DISCOVERY RESPONSES;

3/26/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF RICKY HINTONS DISCOVERY RESPONSES;

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDE...)

3/30/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDE...)

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES;

4/1/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES;

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

4/2/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition Opposition to Motion to Compel Discovery Responses

4/6/2020: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition Opposition to Motion to Compel Discovery Responses

Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

4/30/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/3/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

3/21/2019: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

3/21/2019: Answer - Answer

Notice of Deposit - Jury - Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/21/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury - Notice of Deposit - Jury

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/29/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/29/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/29/2018: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/29/2018: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/29/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • Hearing12/02/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Hearing12/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES;: Filed By: Norma Proctor (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 09/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 09/17/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 09/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")) of 08/13/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 08/13/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 09/17/2020 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketOpposition Opposition to Motion to Compel Discovery Responses; Filed by: Ricky Hinton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Norma Proctor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: Norma Proctor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ricky Hinton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ricky Hinton (Plaintiff); As to: Norma Proctor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC14366    Hearing Date: September 17, 2020    Dept: 26

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

(CCP §§ 2030.290; 2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Norma Proctor’s Motion to Compel Discovery Responses is GRANTED. PLAINTIFF RICKY HINTON IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION TO THE SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, WITHIN 20 DAYS OF SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Ricky Hinton (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendant Norma Proctor (“Defendant”) on November 29, 2018. On July 31, 2019, Defendant served Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents on Plaintiff. (Motion, McClendon Decl. ¶4 and Exh. A.) To date, Defendant has not received any verified responses to the discovery requests from Plaintiff. (Id. at ¶6.) Defendant filed the instant Motion to Compel Discovery Responses on April 1, 2020. On April 6, 2020, Plaintiff’s counsel filed a declaration stating he has lost contact with Plaintiff. (Yeager Decl., filed 4/6/20.)

The Motion initially came for hearing on August 13, 2020 at which time the Court ordered Plaintiff to serve responses to the Form Interrogatories. (Minute Order, 8/13/20.) The Court continued the hearing with respect to the Special Interrogatories and Requests for Production in order to allow Defendant to pay two additional motion filing fees. (Ibid.) Defendant paid the two additional motion filing fees on August 14, 2020.

The Court now finds that due to Plaintiff’s failure to respond written discovery, the Motion is GRANTED as to the Special Interrogatories, Set One and Request for Production of Documents, Set One. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses, without objections, to Special Interrogatories, Set One and Request for Production of Documents, Set One within twenty (20) days of service of this Order. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290, 2031.300.)

Moving party to give notice

Case Number: 18STLC14366    Hearing Date: August 13, 2020    Dept: 26

Hinton v. Proctor, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

(CCP §§ 2030.290; 2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Ricky Hinton’s Motion to Compel Discovery Responses is GRANTED solely as to the Form Interrogatories. DEFENDANT NORMA PROCTOR IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION TO THE FORM INTERROGATORIES WITHIN 20 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

With respect to the remaining discovery requests—the special interrogatories and request for production—the Motion is CONTINUED TO SEPTEMBER 17, 2020 AT 10:00 AM. AT LEAST 16 COURT DAYS PRIOR TO THE NEW HEARING DATE, PLAINTIFF IS TO PAY TWO ADDITIONAL FILING FEES. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT’S ORDERS MAY RESULT IN THE MOTIONS BEING PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Ricky Hinton (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendant Norma Proctor (“Defendant”) on November 29, 2018. On July 31, 2019, Plaintiff served Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents on Defendant. (Motion, McClendon Decl. ¶4 and Exh. A.) To date, Plaintiff has not received any verified responses to the discovery requests from Defendant. (Id. at ¶6.) Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Compel Discovery Responses on April 1, 2020. On April 6, 2020, defense counsel filed a declaration stating he has lost contact with Defendant. (Yeager Decl., filed 4/6/20.)

Discussion

The Court initially addresses the fact that Plaintiff seeks relief with respect to three sets of discovery under a single motion. Yet Plaintiff only paid a single filing fee. Until Plaintiff pays two additional filing fees, the Court can only rule on the Motion as to one set of discovery.

The Court, therefore, finds that due to Defendant’s failure to respond written discovery, the Motion is GRANTED solely as to the Form Interrogatories, Set One. Defendant is ordered to serve verified responses, without objections, to Plaintiff’s Form Interrogatories within twenty (20) days from the date of Defendant serving a notice of this Order. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290, 2031.300.)

With respect to the remaining discovery requests—the special interrogatories and request for production—the Motion is CONTINUED TO SEPTEMBER 17, 2020 AT 10:00 AM. AT LEAST 16 COURT DAYS PRIOR TO THE NEW HEARING DATE, PLAINTIFF IS TO PAY TWO ADDITIONAL FILING FEES. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT’S ORDERS MAY RESULT IN THE MOTIONS BEING PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Moving party to give notice.