Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 01:01:12 (UTC).

RICHARD KAY SAKAI VS DANIEL L. SAKAI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by RICHARD KAY SAKAI against DANIEL L SAKAI in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2824

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAKAI RICHARD KAY

Defendants

CHERI AND RICHARD SAKAI LIVING AUGUST 16 1988 RESTATED MARCH 4 2011

SAKAI DANIEL L.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

10/15/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

10/5/2018: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/10/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Daniel Sakai/ Successor Trustee

10/25/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Daniel Sakai/ Successor Trustee

Correspondence

9/24/2018: Correspondence

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/25/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/25/2018

10/25/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/25/2018

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/25/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Daniel Sakai/ Successor Trustee; Filed by: Richard Kay Sakai (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/25/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/25/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E updated: Result Date to 10/25/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Richard Kay Sakai (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel L. Sakai (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Daniel L. Sakai (Defendant) to Daniel L. Sakai (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Richard Kay Sakai on 09/10/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Daniel L. Sakai (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Correspondence; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Richard Kay Sakai (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel L. Sakai (Defendant); Cheri and Richard Sakai Living, August 16, 1988 Restated March 4, 2011 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Matthew St. George in Department E Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/25/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E

    Read MoreRead Less