Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 10:52:46 (UTC).

RICHARD JAMES HARRINGTON VS CALEB BENENOCH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 RICHARD JAMES HARRINGTON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CALEB BENENOCH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5428

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRINGTON RICHARD JAMES

Pacific Palisades, CA 90272

Defendants

ROBINSON A'SHAWN

Pontiac, MI 48342

BENENOCH CALEB

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Settlement Agreement

1/26/2018: Small Claims Settlement Agreement

(Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

1/26/2018: (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 01/26/2018

1/26/2018: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 01/26/2018

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER

10/20/2017: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER

Notice of motion to set aside as void the default judgment

10/17/2017: Notice of motion to set aside as void the default judgment

Unknown

10/17/2017: Unknown

[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

10/17/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Unknown

10/3/2017: Unknown

[Order on Request for Court Order]

10/3/2017: [Order on Request for Court Order]

Unknown

9/13/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/18/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/13/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/13/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

9/13/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/13/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Unknown

8/28/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/28/2017: Unknown

[Request for Court Order and Answer]

8/28/2017: [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/24/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2018
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 01/26/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 01/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 01/26/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to the written settlement agreement, 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Other - Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Richard James Harrington (Plaintiff); Caleb Benenoch (Defendant); A'Shawn Robinson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER; Filed by: Clerk; As to: A'Shawn Robinson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: A'Shawn Robinson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 01/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Declaration Notice of motion to set aside as void the default judgment; Filed by: Caleb Benenoch (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Updated -- Other - Notice of motion to set aside as void the default judgment: Document Number changed from DEC010 - Declaration (name extension) to MISC090 - Other - (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/13/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 09/13/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Richard James Harrington against Defendant Caleb Benenoch and Defendant A'Shawn Robinson on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Richard James Harrington on 07/24/2017 for the principal amount of $5,332.85 and costs of $200.00 for a total of $5,532.85, joint and several.; Other: Default judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Richard James Harrington (Plaintiff); As to: A'Shawn Robinson (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/01/2017; Service Cost: 200.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: A'Shawn Robinson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Richard James Harrington (Plaintiff); As to: Caleb Benenoch (Defendant); A'Shawn Robinson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less