This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2020 at 11:55:58 (UTC).

RICHARD ELLIS PRESTON, JR, ET AL. VS DERON R YOUNG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 RICHARD ELLIS PRESTON, JR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DERON R YOUNG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT A. MCSORLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0493

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT A. MCSORLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PRESTON MARY RACHELLE

PRESTON RICHARD ELLIS JR

Defendants

YOUNG DERON R

YOUNG DONNA

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 04/15/2020

4/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 04/15/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

4/15/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/3/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

4/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

4/3/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4/3/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • Hearing07/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A22 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 04/15/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 07/02/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]: As To Parties: Richard Ellis Preston, Jr (Plaintiff), Mary Rachelle Preston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2020 at 09:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 05/19/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2020 at 09:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert A. McSorley in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Richard Ellis Preston, Jr (Plaintiff); Mary Rachelle Preston (Plaintiff); As to: Deron R Young (Defendant); Donna Young (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.