This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2018 at 10:24:24 (UTC).

RICHARD DOUGHERTY VS EDGAR ROJAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2017 RICHARD DOUGHERTY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EDGAR ROJAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0643

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOUGHERTY RICHARD

Defendants

ROJAS EDGAR

ROJAS ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/22/2017

12/22/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/22/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

12/22/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/06/2017

11/6/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/06/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

11/6/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

10/31/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/2/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/2/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/18/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/22/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 12/22/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 04/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 04/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to there being no appearance by the plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • The case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Bankruptcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/06/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 12/22/2017 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 04/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 04/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Notice of Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: Edgar Rojas (Defendant); Elizabeth Rojas (Defendant); As to: Richard Dougherty (Plaintiff); Bankruptcy Stay Case Type: Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Stay - Bankruptcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Richard Dougherty (Plaintiff); As to: Edgar Rojas (Defendant); Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Richard Dougherty (Plaintiff); As to: Elizabeth Rojas (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/24/2017; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department 6 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court to 11/06/2017 08:30 AM at 11/06/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Richard Dougherty (Plaintiff); As to: Edgar Rojas (Defendant); Elizabeth Rojas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • Case assigned to in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less