This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 07:32:36 (UTC).

RICH ESTATE PROPERTIES, INC. A CALIF. CORP. VS MARIO O. MARINERO

Case Summary

On 09/22/2017 RICH ESTATE PROPERTIES, INC A CALIF CORP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARIO O MARINERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0358

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICH ESTATE PROPERTIES INC. A CALIF. CORP.

Defendant

MARINERO MARIO O.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK DENNIS PAUL

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

11/8/2017: Writ - Return

Request for Dismissal

1/17/2018: Request for Dismissal

Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - of Plaintiff's attorney and request for money Judgment

1/17/2018: Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - of Plaintiff's attorney and request for money Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

1/17/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/17/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

2/16/2018: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Complaint

9/22/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

9/22/2017: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Summons - on Complaint

9/22/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

9/22/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Mario O. Marinero)

9/22/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Mario O. Marinero)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/22/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Application for Writ of Possession

10/16/2017: Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

10/18/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/16/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/16/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Rich Estate Properties, Inc. A Calif. Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Mario O. Marinero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff Rich Estate Properties, Inc. A Calif. Corp. against Defendant Mario O. Marinero on the Complaint filed by Rich Estate Properties, Inc. A Calif. Corp. on 09/22/2017 for holdover damages $2,500.00 and costs of $457.00 for a total of $2,957.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Rich Estate Properties, Inc. A Calif. Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Rich Estate Properties, Inc. A Calif. Corp. on 09/22/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to Mario O. Marinero; On the Complaint filed by Rich Estate Properties, Inc. A Calif. Corp. on 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: Status Date changed from 02/16/2018 to 01/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Rich Estate Properties, Inc. A Calif. Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration of Plaintiff's attorney and request for money Judgment; Filed by: Rich Estate Properties, Inc. A Calif. Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Rich Estate Properties, Inc. A Calif. Corp. (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Rich Estate Properties, Inc. A Calif. Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Mario O. Marinero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rich Estate Properties, Inc. A Calif. Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, OSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion to 03/20/2018 08:30 AM at 03/20/2018 8:30 AM OSC - Failure to File Proof of Service in Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RICH ESTATE PROPERTIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOCK DENNIS P.