Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2019 at 05:42:55 (UTC).

RICBERAY, INC. VS COVARRUBIAS, JORGE

Case Summary

On 02/10/2017 RICBERAY, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COVARRUBIAS, JORGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1654

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RICBERAY INC.

RICBERAY INC. DBA SUNSET GARDENS-WEST MOBILEHOME PARK

Defendants

COVARRUBIAS ALMIDA

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

COVARRUBIAS JORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GREGORY BEAM & ASSOCIATES, INC.

GREGORY BEAM & ASSOCIATES INC.

Defendant Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER LAURIA

LAURIA CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Fix and Determine Fees)

8/23/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Fix and Determine Fees)

Notice of Ruling

9/8/2017: Notice of Ruling

Judgment

11/7/2017: Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketJudgment; Signed and Filed by: RICBERAY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketStipulated judgment entered for Plaintiff RICBERAY, INC. DBA SUNSET GARDENS-WEST MOBILEHOME PARK against Defendant COVARRUBIAS, ALMIDA AN INDIVIDUAL and Defendant COVARRUBIAS, JORGE AN INDIVIDUAL on the Complaint filed by RICBERAY, INC. on 02/10/2017 for attorney fees of $31,976.00 and costs of $637.89 for a total of $32,613.89.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketNotice of Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs; Filed by: RICBERAY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Fix and Determine Fees)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Fix and Determine Fees scheduled for 08/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 updated: Result Date to 08/23/2017; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, OSC - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketMOTION FILED: MOT FIX & DET FEES (1717) HEARING SET FOR 8/23/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF GREGORY B. BEAM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DECLARATION OF GREGORY B. BEAM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT/PLAINTIFF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT/PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketOPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR A PERMANENT INJUNCTION; OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR A PERMANENT INJUNCTION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY ESPINOZA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY ESPINOZA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO OPPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF GREGORY B. BEAM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF GREGORY B. BEAM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF RICARDO EXPINOZA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF RICARDO EXPINOZA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ISSUANCE PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ISSUANCE OF INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS OF JORGE PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS OF JORGE COVARRUBIAS, GREGORY PRICE AND CHRISTOPHER J. LAURIA FILED IN OPPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER RE: RECLASSIFICATION TO LIMITED JURISDICTION; MINUTE ORDER RE: RECLASSIFICATION TO LIMITED JURISDICTION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketTRANSFER/COORDINATION/CONSOLIDATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RICBERAY INC. DBA SUNSET GARDENS-WEST MOBILEHOME PARK is a litigant