This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2019 at 00:38:11 (UTC).

RICARDO VASQUEZ VS JORGE ALEJANDRO SIGUI ARCHILA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/27/2018 RICARDO VASQUEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JORGE ALEJANDRO SIGUI ARCHILA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0575

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VASQUEZ RICARDO

Chino, CA 91710

Defendants

SIGUI ARCHILA JORGE ALEJANDRO

Long Beach, CA 90813

ROJAS ARTURO LARA

South Gate, CA 90280

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/2/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/10/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs - Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

5/10/2019: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs - Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/10/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/10/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

5/10/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/10/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/17/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/15/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/15/2019

2/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/15/2019

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/27/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/27/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff RICARDO VASQUEZ against Defendant JORGE ALEJANDRO SIGUI ARCHILA on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by RICARDO VASQUEZ on 12/27/2018 for the principal amount of $8,282.05 for a total of $8,282.05.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $115.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant JORGE ALEJANDRO SIGUI ARCHILA. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by RICARDO VASQUEZ on 12/27/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to ARTURO LARA ROJAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/10/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk; As to: JORGE ALEJANDRO SIGUI ARCHILA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 05/10/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: RICARDO VASQUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: JORGE ALEJANDRO SIGUI ARCHILA (Defendant); Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 05/10/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/15/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: RICARDO VASQUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: ARTURO LARA ROJAS (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/08/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: RICARDO VASQUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: JORGE ALEJANDRO SIGUI ARCHILA (Defendant); ARTURO LARA ROJAS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: RICARDO VASQUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: RICARDO VASQUEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.