This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2018 at 05:07:38 (UTC).

RETIREMENT INVESTMENT ACQUISIT VS VASQUEZ, MARIO VEGA

Case Summary

On 11/18/2014 RETIREMENT INVESTMENT ACQUISIT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VASQUEZ, MARIO VEGA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY WINIKOW. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8999

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JEFFREY WINIKOW

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RETIREMENT INVESTMENT ACQUISITION 1 LLC

Defendants

VASQUEZ MARIO VEGA

NAPOLEON BAKERY INC.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/17/2016: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2016
  • Address for (RETIREMENT INVESTMENT ACQUISITION) (1 LLC) (Plaintiff) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: (RETIREMENT INVESTMENT ACQUISITION) (1 LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AS TO NAPOLEON BAKERY INC DBA MELROSE BAKERY COMPANY DUE TO NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AS TO (NAPOLEON BAKERY INC.) DUE TO NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. JEFFREY WINIKOW PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (RETIREMENT INVESTMENT ACQUISITION) (1 LLC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 02/09/15 . FOR (RETIREMENT INVESTMENT ACQUISITION) (1 LLC) . AGAINST (VASQUEZ, MARIO VEGA) . PRINCIPAL $ 1225.00 . COSTS $ 135.00 . TOTAL $ 1360.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (VASQUEZ, MARIO VEGA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (NAPOLEON BAKERY INC.) . COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (VASQUEZ, MARIO VEGA) . COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (NAPOLEON BAKERY INC.) . COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • AMENDMENT TO CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED , TO ADD A THIRD DEFENDANT. ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC451926026. HEARING SET FOR 02/09/15 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NAPOLEON BAKERY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where RETIREMENT INVESTMENT ACQUISITION 1 LLC is a litigant