This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 00:33:03 (UTC).

RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LP VS JAMES GIPSON

Case Summary

On 04/16/2018 RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JAMES GIPSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARILYN M MORDETZKY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2159

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARILYN M MORDETZKY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK LP

Defendant

GIPSON JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

6/13/2018: Writ - Return

Writ of Execution

5/8/2018: Writ of Execution

Application for Writ of Possession

5/8/2018: Application for Writ of Possession

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

5/2/2018: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

5/1/2018: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/1/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/1/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

5/1/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/1/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

5/1/2018: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

4/17/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (James Gipson)

4/17/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (James Gipson)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/16/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

4/16/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Summons - on Complaint

4/16/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/16/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/16/2018: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Residences At Village Walk, LP (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possessiion; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/25/2018 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketPremise address is amended to 5420 Yolanda Avenue #117, Tarzana, CA 91356.; Default judgment entered for Plaintiff Residences At Village Walk, LP against Defendant James Gipson, an individual on the Complaint filed by Residences At Village Walk, LP on 04/16/2018 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 5420 Yolanda Avenue #117, Tarzana, CA 91356 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Residences At Village Walk, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Does: Doe defendants only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Residences At Village Walk, LP on 04/16/2018, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does Doe defendants only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Residences At Village Walk, LP (Plaintiff); As to: James Gipson (Defendant); Service Date: 04/18/2018; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to James Gipson; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Residences At Village Walk, LP on 04/16/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketRequest/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial; Filed by: Residences At Village Walk, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 04/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Residences At Village Walk, LP (Plaintiff); As to: James Gipson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Residences At Village Walk, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Marilyn M Mordetzky in Department H Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/25/2018 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Civil Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY