This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/09/2019 at 13:18:08 (UTC).

RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LP VS BRANDON GLASGOW, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BRANDON GLASGOW,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EMILY GARCIA UHRIG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0757

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

EMILY GARCIA UHRIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK LP

Defendants

GLASGOW BRANDON

TONEY KYLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEINBERG LAURENCE

 

Court Documents

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

5/3/2019: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

5/1/2019: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

5/1/2019: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/26/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/26/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

4/26/2019: Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

4/26/2019: Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

3/29/2019: Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

3/22/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (BRANDON GLASGOW)

3/22/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (BRANDON GLASGOW)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (KYLA TONEY)

3/22/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (KYLA TONEY)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

3/20/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

3/20/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/20/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/20/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Writ - Return - Writ - Return (Wholly Satisfied as to Possession)

5/31/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return (Wholly Satisfied as to Possession)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return (Wholly Satisfied as to Possession) ( ); Non-Party / Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LP (Plaintiff); As to: BRANDON GLASGOW (Defendant); KYLA TONEY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LP (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 109.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LP against Defendant BRANDON GLASGOW and Defendant KYLA TONEY on the Complaint filed by RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LP on 03/20/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 5420 Yolanda Avenue, Apt. 129, Tarzana, CA 91356 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LP on 03/20/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LP, does Doe defendants only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LP (Plaintiff); As to: BRANDON GLASGOW (Defendant); KYLA TONEY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Posting; Filed by: RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LP (Plaintiff); As to: KYLA TONEY (Defendant); Mailing Date: 04/10/2019; Service Cost: 67.75; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LP (Plaintiff); As to: BRANDON GLASGOW (Defendant); KYLA TONEY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post; Signed and Filed by: RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LP (Plaintiff); As to: BRANDON GLASGOW (Defendant); KYLA TONEY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 03/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Civil Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Emily Garcia Uhrig in Department H Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LP (Plaintiff); As to: BRANDON GLASGOW (Defendant); KYLA TONEY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LP (Plaintiff); As to: BRANDON GLASGOW (Defendant); KYLA TONEY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK, LP (Plaintiff); As to: BRANDON GLASGOW (Defendant); KYLA TONEY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESIDENCES AT VILLAGE WALK LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY