This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2020 at 09:03:46 (UTC).

RENATO C FABIAN VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 RENATO C FABIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8902

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FABIAN RENATO C

Defendant

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEWTON CARSON CADET

Defendant Attorney

OTANO-GUILBE JORGE MIGUEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

7/6/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/16/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Meet and Confer Declaration of Jorge M. Otano in Support of Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages

3/12/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Meet and Confer Declaration of Jorge M. Otano in Support of Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

2/13/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer and Proof of Service

2/3/2020: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer and Proof of Service

Reply (name extension) - Reply City Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint

2/6/2020: Reply (name extension) - Reply City Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

2/10/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

2/10/2020: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/10/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

12/13/2019: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

11/13/2019: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

9/27/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

9/27/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/27/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/27/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • Hearing09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Hearing03/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 07/06/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 07/06/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 04/27/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 07/06/2020 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Meet and Confer Declaration of Jorge M. Otano in Support of Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 02/13/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/27/2020 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 12/12/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Renato C Fabian (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Renato C Fabian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC08902    Hearing Date: July 06, 2020    Dept: 25

DEMURRER

(CCP § 430.10, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant City of Los Angeles’ Demurrer is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. The action is RECLASSIFIED as a Writs and Receivers case and transferred to the transfer/reclassification desk for collection of fees and reassignment to the Writs and Receivers Department. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days of this order.

SERVICE

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: Filed on February 3, 2020 [   ] Late [   ] None

REPLY: Filed on February 6, 2020 [   ] Late [   ] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On September 27, 2019, Plaintiff Renato Fabian (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for breach of contract and reinstatement of a 2.75% salary increase against Defendant City of Los Angeles (“Defendant”).

On November 13, 2019, Defendant filed the instant Demurrer to Plaintiff’s Complaint (the “Demurrer”). On February 3, 2020, Plaintiff filed an Opposition and on February 6, 2020, Defendant filed a Reply.

At the initial hearing on February 13, 2020, the Court declined to consider the merits of the demurrer in light of Defendant’s lack of meet and confer declaration. (2/13/20 Minute Order.) Defendant was ordered to meet and confer with Plaintiff in person or by telephone and to file a declaration attesting to such efforts. (Id.) On March 12, 2020, Defendant filed the requested declaration.

Plaintiff alleges the worked at the Los Angeles Department of Building and Safety (“LADBS”) from January 21, 1997 through January 23, 2015 and that while he worked there, he became eligible for a 2.75% salary increase. (Compl., ¶¶ 1, 15, 18, 24.) After leaving his position with LADBS for a short period and then returning to his same position, Defendant determined he was no longer eligible for the increase and sought reimbursement of the 2.75% increase already paid to Plaintiff. (Id. at ¶ 27, 33, 42.)  

In addition to damages for the breach of contract cause of action and payment of the 2.75% increase for the period Plaintiff was allegedly deprived of that benefit, Plaintiff seeks declaratory relief. Specifically, Plaintiff seeks (1) recognition that he is not a new employee of the city merely because he transferred between one major department/division of Defendant to another and back; (2) recognition that Plaintiff has remained an active employee of Defendant from January 21, 1997 through present; (3) a declaration that the rules and regulations of the Los Angeles Board of Civil Service Commissioners supersede any part or provision of Memorandum Agreement No. 5 that is in conflict or inconsistent with those rules and regulations; (4) a declaration invalidating the overpayment interpretation of the Los Angeles City Administrative Office; and (5) reinstatement of the 2.75% salary increase. (Compl., p. 9:28-10:18.)

The Court notes that, pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 580, subdivision (b)(4), “[d]eclaratory relief, except as authorized by section 86” is not permissible in a limited jurisdiction court. Section 86 permits an action for declaratory relief when it is brought by way of cross-complaint or when sought to conduct a trial after a nonbinding fee arbitration between an attorney and his client. (Code Civ. Proc., § 86, subd. (a)(7).) Here, Plaintiff’s requests for a mandate against a public entity and for declaratory relief are outside the jurisdiction of this Court. (See Code Civ. Proc., §§ 85, 86, subds. (a)(7), (b).)

Accordingly, the action is reclassified as a Writs and Receivers case.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant City of Los Angeles’ Demurrer is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. The action is RECLASSIFIED as a Writs and Receivers case and transferred to the transfer/reclassification desk for collection of fees and reassignment to the Writs and Receivers Department. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days of this order.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: 19STLC08902    Hearing Date: July 02, 2020    Dept: 25

DEMURRER

(CCP § 430.10, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant City of Los Angeles’ Demurrer is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. The action is RECLASSIFIED as a Writs and Receivers case and transferred to the transfer/reclassification desk for collection of fees and reassignment to the Writs and Receivers Department. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days of this order.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: Filed on February 3, 2020 [ ] Late [ ] None

REPLY: Filed on February 6, 2020 [ ] Late [ ] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On September 27, 2019, Plaintiff Renato Fabian (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for breach of contract and reinstatement of a 2.75% salary increase against Defendant City of Los Angeles (“Defendant”).

On November 13, 2019, Defendant filed the instant Demurrer to Plaintiff’s Complaint (the “Demurrer”). On February 3, 2020, Plaintiff filed an Opposition and on February 6, 2020, Defendant filed a Reply.

At the initial hearing on February 13, 2020, the Court declined to consider the merits of the demurrer in light of Defendant’s lack of meet and confer declaration. (2/13/20 Minute Order.) Defendant was ordered to meet and confer with Plaintiff in person or by telephone and to file a declaration attesting to such efforts. (Id.) On March 12, 2020, Defendant filed the requested declaration.

Plaintiff alleges the worked at the Los Angeles Department of Building and Safety (“LADBS”) from January 21, 1997 through January 23, 2015 and that while he worked there, he became eligible for a 2.75% salary increase. (Compl., ¶¶ 1, 15, 18, 24.) After leaving his position with LADBS for a short period and then returning to his same position, Defendant determined he was no longer eligible for the increase and sought reimbursement of the 2.75% increase already paid to Plaintiff. (Id. at ¶ 27, 33, 42.)

In addition to damages for the breach of contract cause of action and payment of the 2.75% increase for the period Plaintiff was allegedly deprived of that benefit, Plaintiff seeks declaratory relief. Specifically, Plaintiff seeks (1) recognition that he is not a new employee of the city merely because he transferred between one major department/division of Defendant to another and back; (2) recognition that Plaintiff has remained an active employee of Defendant from January 21, 1997 through present; (3) a declaration that the rules and regulations of the Los Angeles Board of Civil Service Commissioners supersede any part or provision of Memorandum Agreement No. 5 that is in conflict or inconsistent with those rules and regulations; (4) a declaration invalidating the overpayment interpretation of the Los Angeles City Administrative Office; and (5) reinstatement of the 2.75% salary increase. (Compl., p. 9:28-10:18.)

The Court notes that, pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 580, subdivision (b)(4), “[d]eclaratory relief, except as authorized by section 86” is not permissible in a limited jurisdiction court. Section 86 permits an action for declaratory relief when it is brought by way of cross-complaint or when sought to conduct a trial after a nonbinding fee arbitration between an attorney and his client. (Code Civ. Proc., § 86, subd. (a)(7).) Here, Plaintiff’s requests for a mandate against a public entity and for declaratory relief are outside the jurisdiction of this Court. (See Code Civ. Proc., §§ 85, 86, subds. (a)(7), (b).)

Accordingly, the action is reclassified as a Writs and Receivers case.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant City of Los Angeles’ Demurrer is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. The action is RECLASSIFIED as a Writs and Receivers case and transferred to the transfer/reclassification desk for collection of fees and reassignment to the Writs and Receivers Department. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days of this order.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: 19STLC08902    Hearing Date: February 13, 2020    Dept: 25

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant City of Los Angeles’ Demurrer to Plaintiff’s Complaint is CONTINUED TO APRIL 27, 2020, AT 10:30 A.M. in Department 25, SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Defendant must file and serve a declaration demonstrating compliance with the meet and confer requirement. Failure to comply with the Court’s order may result in the Demurrer being placed off calendar or denied.

OPPOSITION: Filed on February 3, 2020 [X] Late

REPLY: Filed on February 6, 2020 [ ] Late [ ] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On September 27, 2019, Plaintiff Renato C. Fabian (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for breach of contract against Defendant City of Los Angeles (“Defendant”).

On November 13, 2019, Defendant filed the instant Demurrer to Plaintiff’s Complaint (the “Demurrer”). On February 3, 2020, Plaintiff filed a late Opposition and on February 6, 2020, Defendant filed a Reply.

  1. Legal Standard

“The primary function of a pleading is to give the other party notice so that it may prepare its

case [citation], and a defect in a pleading that otherwise properly notifies a party cannot be said to

affect substantial rights.” (Harris v. City of Santa Monica (2013) 56 Cal.4th 203, 240.)

“A demurrer tests the legal sufficiency of the factual allegations in a complaint.” (Ivanoff v. Bank of

America, N.A. (2017) 9 Cal.App.5th 719, 725.) The Court looks to whether “the complaint alleges

facts sufficient to state a cause of action or discloses a complete defense.” (Id.) The Court does not

“read passages from a complaint in isolation; in reviewing a ruling on a demurrer, we read the

complaint ‘as a whole and its parts in their context.’ [Citation.]” (West v. JPMorgan Chase Bank,

N.A. (2013) 214 Cal.App.4th 780, 804.) The Court “assume[s] the truth of the properly pleaded

factual allegations, facts that reasonably can be inferred from those expressly pleaded and matters of

which judicial notice has been taken.” (Harris, supra, 56 Cal.4th p. 240.) “The court does not,

however, assume the truth of contentions, deductions or conclusions of law. [Citation.]” (Durell v.

Sharp Healthcare (2010) 183 Cal.App.4th 1350, 1358.)

Leave to amend must be allowed where there is a reasonable possibility of successful amendment. (Goodman v. Kennedy (1976) 18 Cal.3d 335, 348.) The burden is on the complainant to show the Court that a pleading can be amended successfully. (Id.)

Finally, Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41 requires that “[b]efore filing a demurrer pursuant to this chapter, the demurring party shall meet and confer in person or by telephone with the party who filed the pleading that is subject to demurrer for the purpose of determining whether an agreement can be reached that would resolve the objections to be raised in the demurrer.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 430.41, subd. (a).) The parties are to meet and confer at least five days before the date the responsive pleading is due. (Code Civ. Proc., § 430.41, subd. (a)(2).) Thereafter, the demurring party shall file and serve a declaration detailing their meet and confer efforts. (Code Civ. Proc., § 430.41, subd. (a)(3).)

  1. Discussion

As an initial matter, the Court notes that Defendant’s Demurrer is not accompanied by a declaration setting forth any efforts to meet and confer with Plaintiff before filing this motion as required by Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (a). Accordingly, Defendant is ordered to meet and confer with Plaintiff in person or by telephone and thereafter file and serve a declaration attesting to such efforts at least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant City of Los Angeles’ Demurrer to Plaintiff’s Complaint is CONTINUED TO APRIL 27, 2020 AT 10:30 A.M. in Department 25. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Defendant must file and serve a declaration demonstrating compliance with the meet and confer requirement. Failure to comply with the Court’s order may result in the Demurrer being placed off calendar or denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.