This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2020 at 09:54:13 (UTC).

RENATA SDAO, ET AL. VS YAAKOV DINA

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 RENATA SDAO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YAAKOV DINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4830

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

ALFORD BONITA

SDAO RENATA

Defendant and Respondent

DINA YAAKOV

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/21/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Hearing

4/29/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Hearing

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Order for Clarification and/or Correcti...) of 08/03/2020

8/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Order for Clarification and/or Correcti...) of 08/03/2020

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Bonita Alford

3/13/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Bonita Alford

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Renata Sdao

3/13/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Renata Sdao

Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal NOA:10/15/19 BV033263

12/17/2019: Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal NOA:10/15/19 BV033263

Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance - Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance

12/3/2019: Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance - Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance

Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal - Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

10/21/2019: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal - Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

9/13/2019: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

8/26/2019: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/26/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/7/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

5/20/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/20/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/20/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/20/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Order for Clarification and/or Correcti...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Order for Clarification and/or Correcti...) of 08/03/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Order for Clarification and/or Correction of Final Judgment scheduled for 08/03/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 08/03/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance of Hearing; Filed by: Renata Sdao (Plaintiff); Bonita Alford (Plaintiff); As to: Renata Sdao (Plaintiff); Bonita Alford (Plaintiff); Yaakov Dina (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order: Result: Stricken; Result Date: 04/21/2020; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 26 - Hon. Serena R. Murillo; Reason: Transfer for Reassignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Motion for Order for Clarification and/or Correction of Final Judgment scheduled for 08/03/2020 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08/03/2020 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Motion for Order for Clarification and/or Correction of Final Judgment scheduled for 06/04/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08/03/2020 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Renata Sdao, et al. on 05/20/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Bonita Alford and Renata Sdao, does 1-25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Renata Sdao (Plaintiff); Bonita Alford (Plaintiff); As to: Yaakov Dina (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/31/2019; Service Cost: 100.75; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Renata Sdao (Plaintiff); Bonita Alford (Plaintiff); As to: Yaakov Dina (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Renata Sdao (Plaintiff); Bonita Alford (Plaintiff); As to: Yaakov Dina (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Renata Sdao (Plaintiff); Bonita Alford (Plaintiff); As to: Yaakov Dina (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC04830    Hearing Date: August 03, 2020    Dept: 26

MOTION TO CLARIFY OR CORRECT JUDGMENT

(CCP § 2025.430)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiffs Renata Sdao and Bonita Alford’s Motion to Clarify or Correct Judgment is DENIED.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiffs Renata Sdao and Bonita Alford (“Plaintiffs”) filed the instant action for failure to return security deposit against Defendant Yaakov Dina (“Defendant”) on May 20, 2019. Default was entered against Defendant on August 26, 2019, with default judgment following on September 13, 2019. The default judgment was entered in the amount of $6,700.00 principal. The judgment further indicated that damages for bad faith and punitive damages were not awarded on the default judgment.

On March 13, 2020, Plaintiffs filed the instant Motion to Clarify or Correct Judgment. The Motion is brought pursuant to Civil Code section 1950.5, subdivision (l). However, correction of the judgment is not authorized under the moving statute, which merely pertains to the basis for statutory damages against a landlord for bad faith retention of the security deposit. Correction of a judgment for clerical error can be brought pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 473, subdivision (d), but Plaintiffs do not appear to contend the judgment should be corrected for because of a clerical error. The judgment plainly states that bad faith and punitive damages are not awarded. Therefore, Plaintiffs have not demonstrated a legal basis to clarify or correct the judgment.

Conclusion

Plaintiffs Renata Sdao and Bonita Alford’s Motion to Clarify or Correct Judgment is DENIED.

Court clerk to give notice.