This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2020 at 01:17:01 (UTC).

RENATA MILLET-RIGALI VS BRIAN NGUYEN

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 RENATA MILLET-RIGALI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRIAN NGUYEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5986

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLET-RIGALI RENATA

Defendant

NGUYEN BRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

STOLL RICHARD MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss)

7/29/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Ruling on Motion for Judgment of Dismissal

8/18/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Ruling on Motion for Judgment of Dismissal

Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment of Dismissal

1/13/2020: Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment of Dismissal

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Ruling on General Demurrer to Complaint

9/24/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Ruling on General Demurrer to Complaint

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

9/19/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

8/20/2019: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

8/20/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/26/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

6/26/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -ADDITIONAL COURT FEES

6/27/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -ADDITIONAL COURT FEES

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/26/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/26/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/26/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling on Motion for Judgment of Dismissal; Filed by: Brian Nguyen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Dismiss scheduled for 07/29/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 07/29/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/29/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Dismiss scheduled for 07/29/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketMotion re: Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment of Dismissal; Filed by: Brian Nguyen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling on General Demurrer to Complaint; Filed by: Brian Nguyen (Defendant); As to: Renata Millet-Rigali (Plaintiff); Brian Nguyen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 09/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 09/19/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: Renata Millet-Rigali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Renata Millet-Rigali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Renata Millet-Rigali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Renata Millet-Rigali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC05986    Hearing Date: July 29, 2020    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE:   Wed., July 29, 2020 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Millet-Rigali v. Nguyen COMPL. FILED: 06-26-19

CASE NUMBER: 19STLC05986 DISC. C/O: 11-23-20

NOTICE:   OK DISC. MOT. C/O:    12-08-20

TRIAL DATE: 12-23-20

PROCEEDINGS    MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

MOVING PARTY:   Defendant Brian Nguyen

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO DISMISS

(CCP § 581)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Brian Nguyen’s Motion for Judgment of Dismissal is GRANTED. Plaintiff’s Complaint is HEREBY DISMISSED.

SERVICE

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of July 27, 2020 [   ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of July 27, 2020 [   ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On June 26, 2019, Plaintiff Renata Millet-Rigali (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for breach of contract, common counts, and general negligence, in pro per, against Defendant Brian Nguyen (“Defendant”).

On August 20, 2019, Defendant filed a Demurrer to Complaint (the “Demurrer”). No opposition was filed. On September 19, 2019, the Court sustained the Demurrer as to the entire Complaint without leave to amend. (9/19/19 Minute Order.)

On January 13, 2020, Defendant filed the instant Motion for Judgment of Dismissal (the “Motion”). To date, no opposition has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard & Discussion

The Court may dismiss a complaint when, after a demurrer to the complaint is sustained without leave to amend, any party moves for dismissal. (Code Civ. Proc., § 581, subd. (f)(1).)

Here, Defendant’s Demurrer to Plaintiff’s Complaint was sustained without leave to amend on September 19, 2019. (9/19/19 Minute Order.) Accordingly, Defendant’s Motion is GRANTED.

 

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant Brian Nguyen’s Motion for Judgment of Dismissal is GRANTED. Plaintiff’s Complaint is HEREBY DISMISSED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.