This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/03/2019 at 00:19:55 (UTC).

RELIANCE HOME SERVICES, INC. VS GRACE DAWSON

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 RELIANCE HOME SERVICES, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GRACE DAWSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1347

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RELIANCE HOME SERVICES INC. DBA PIONEER PLUMBING HEATING AND AIR DBA PIONEER PLUMBING HEATING AND AIR

8599 Venice Blvd.,

Los Angeles, CA 90034

Defendant

DAWSON GRACE

Pasadena, CA 91104

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/1/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/01/2019

5/1/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/01/2019

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/01/2019

5/1/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/01/2019

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/8/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

3/27/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

3/27/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/27/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/01/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/01/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by RELIANCE HOME SERVICES, INC. on 03/27/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 05/01/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: RELIANCE HOME SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Grace Dawson (Defendant); Service Cost: 90.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): Name Extension: (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G. Cortez in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: RELIANCE HOME SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Grace Dawson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RELIANCE HOME SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant