Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2017 at 20:41:00 (UTC).

REGISTERED DIETITIAN CONSULTANTS, INC. VS BLANCA GARCIA

Case Summary

On 12/23/2016 REGISTERED DIETITIAN CONSULTANTS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BLANCA GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5778

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGISTERED DIETITIAN CONSULTANTS INC.

34162 Capistrano By The Sea

Dana Point, CA 92629

Defendant

GARCIA BLANCA

Altadena, CA 91001

 

Court Documents

[Order on Request for Court Order {Correspondence received 03-08-17}]

3/9/2017: [Order on Request for Court Order {Correspondence received 03-08-17}]

Order on Request for Court Order - {Correspondence received 03-08-17}

3/9/2017: Order on Request for Court Order - {Correspondence received 03-08-17}

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

3/2/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

3/2/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Mary Dubois

2/27/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Mary Dubois

Minute Order of 02/27/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2/27/2017: Minute Order of 02/27/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/27/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/30/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

12/23/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/23/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

12/23/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

6/7/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

[Notice of Rejection]

5/30/2017: [Notice of Rejection]

Notice of Rejection

5/30/2017: Notice of Rejection

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Mary Dubois

4/11/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Mary Dubois

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/12/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

4/11/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

4/11/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/21/2017 ; Status Date changed from 06/14/2017 to 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/14/2017 ; Status Date changed from 04/11/2017 to 06/14/2017 ; Status changed from Vacated to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Registered Dietitian Consultants, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Blanca Garcia (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration: Result: Granted; Result Date: 04/11/2017; Disposition Date changed from 04/11/2017 to 04/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Mary Dubois; Filed by: Registered Dietitian Consultants, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Mary Dubois; Filed by: Registered Dietitian Consultants, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Registered Dietitian Consultants, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Blanca Garcia (Defendant); Service Cost: 79.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1161223E1349 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1161223E1349 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Registered Dietitian Consultants, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Blanca Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less