This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2020 at 20:21:13 (UTC).

REGENCY APARTMENTS VS DAVID M. REYES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 REGENCY APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DAVID M REYES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0449

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGENCY APARTMENTS

Defendants

HOSKINS SHANDIE R.

REYES DAVID M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPARKS VALERIE A.

 

Court Documents

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

3/12/2020: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

3/11/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/10/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/10/2020: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

2/14/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (David M. Reyes)

2/14/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (David M. Reyes)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Shandie R. Hoskins)

2/14/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Shandie R. Hoskins)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

2/13/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/13/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

2/13/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

8/19/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied); Clerk; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: REGENCY APARTMENTS (Plaintiff); As to: David M. Reyes (Defendant); Shandie R. Hoskins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: REGENCY APARTMENTS (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: REGENCY APARTMENTS (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 02/15/2020; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: REGENCY APARTMENTS (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; David M. Reyes (Defendant); Shandie R. Hoskins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: REGENCY APARTMENTS (Plaintiff); As to: David M. Reyes (Defendant); Shandie R. Hoskins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: REGENCY APARTMENTS (Plaintiff); As to: David M. Reyes (Defendant); Service Date: 02/15/2020; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to David M. Reyes; Shandie R. Hoskins; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by REGENCY APARTMENTS on 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff REGENCY APARTMENTS against Defendant David M. Reyes and Defendant Shandie R. Hoskins on the Complaint filed by REGENCY APARTMENTS on 02/13/2020 for a total of $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: REGENCY APARTMENTS (Plaintiff); As to: Shandie R. Hoskins (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/15/2020; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: REGENCY APARTMENTS (Plaintiff); As to: David M. Reyes (Defendant); Shandie R. Hoskins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: REGENCY APARTMENTS (Plaintiff); As to: David M. Reyes (Defendant); Shandie R. Hoskins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: REGENCY APARTMENTS (Plaintiff); As to: David M. Reyes (Defendant); Shandie R. Hoskins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department R Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REGENCY APTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sparks, Valerie