This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/24/2016 at 19:39:36 (UTC).

REED, GRACIE VS SANDSTONE PROPERTIES L P

Case Summary

On 08/16/2013 REED, GRACIE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SANDSTONE PROPERTIES L P. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0441

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REED GRACIE

Defendants

SANDSTONE PROPERTIES L P

RELIABLE GENERAL PARTNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CENTER FOR DISABILITY ACCESS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES-CONTD TO 03/05/14 AT 08:30 A M IN DEPT. 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • PLSINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS PURUSANT TO CCP 2034.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS PURSUANT TO CCP 2034.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • TSC HELD, MINUTES FILED-TRIAL DATE SET FOR 02/03/14 DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • THIRD PARTY ADDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • CASE ORDERED REMANDED BACK INTO UNLIMITED CASE KC063642 AS OF 04/02/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • TSC. SET 10/17/13, 0830 AM, DEPT 77, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • TRANSFER/COORDINATION/CONSOLIDATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RP PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where SANDSTONE PROPERTIES LP is a litigant