This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2019 at 00:03:01 (UTC).

RED DIAMOND STEEL INC VS 612 N FULLER LLC

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 RED DIAMOND STEEL INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 612 N FULLER LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2407

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RED DIAMOND STEEL INC

Defendant

612 N FULLER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF LESLIE RICHARDS APC

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/23/2017

8/23/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/23/2017

Order - Dismissal

8/23/2017: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/23/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/23/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 updated: Result Date to 08/23/2017; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketOrder for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to CCP Section 581(b)(3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 08/23/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • DocketOSC SET 02/25/19, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - OTHER REAL PROPERTY Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 612 N FULLER AVE LLC is a litigant