This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 06:57:31 (UTC).

RED CURB INVESTMENTS, LLC VS PADILLA, JENNIFER

Case Summary

On 06/15/2012 RED CURB INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PADILLA, JENNIFER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0556

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RED CURB INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants

PADILLA JENNIFER

PADILLA JULIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POOLE, KENNETH J

Defendant Attorneys

PADILLA, JENNIFER

PADILLA, JULIO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2012
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT FULLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • WRIT REJECT LETTER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY REJECTED (LA COUNTY) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • MOTION FILED: MISCELLANEOUS MOTION HEARING SET FOR 7/26/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • STIPULATED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • STIPULATED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2012
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES-CONTD TO 07/26/12 AT 08:30 A M IN DEPT. 88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 07/12/12, 08:30 AM, DEPT 88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.