This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/06/2018 at 23:27:09 (UTC).

RAZEGGI, NICKI VS CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNER

Case Summary

On 06/06/2012 RAZEGGI, NICKI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID PALLACK and MINA D. FRIED. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3252

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID PALLACK

MINA D. FRIED

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAZEGGI NICKI

Defendants

CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNER ASSOCIATION

ROSS MORGAN & COMPANY INC. AAMC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2013
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • DocketABANDONEMENT OF APPEAL RECEIVED AS TO (CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNER ASSOCIATION) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • DocketABANDONMENT OF APPEAL FILED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • DocketMATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO TO 02/08/13 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWD .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/18/13 , AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWC OF THE VAN NUYS SUPERIOR COURT-EAST BUILDING; 3RD FLOOR, ROOM 310 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED BY (CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNER ASSOCIATION) . RECEIPT # LAV522290016 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNER ASSOCIATION) , (ROSS MORGAN & COMPANY INC. AAMC) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NWZ , HON. DAVID PALLACK PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2012
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ROSS MORGAN & COMPANY INC. AAMC) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ , HON. MINA D. FRIED PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 10/01/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • DocketCOPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNER ASSOCIATION) . RECEIPT # LAV485216012 . 70112970000004716418

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • DocketCOPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (ROSS MORGAN & COMPANY INC. AAMC) . RECEIPT # LAV485216012 . 70110470000339147513

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNER ASSOCIATION) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO CLAIM OF (RAZEGGI, NICKI) FILED AMENDING DEFENDANT'S NAME ,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • DocketCOPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNER ASSOCIATION) . RECEIPT # LAV441726024 . 7011 3500 0002 7510 9874

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (ROSS MORGAN & COMPANY INC) AAMC FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/06/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT NWZ . SERVICE COSTS: $ 35.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAV502663025 . HEARING SET FOR 08/06/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ROSS MORGAN AND COMPANY INC. is a litigant