This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 09:08:21 (UTC).

RAMOS, LIDIA VS DALE, RENEE DENISE

Case Summary

On 02/15/2013 RAMOS, LIDIA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DALE, RENEE DENISE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0174

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMOS LIDIA

Defendant

DALE RENEE DENISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMOS, LIDIA

Defendant Attorney

DALE, RENEE DENISE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2013
  • WRIT REJECT LETTER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY REJECTED (LA COUNTY) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2013
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT FULLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT WHOLLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DECLARATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • MOTION FILED: EX PARTE MOTION HEARING SET FOR 3/29/13

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION AS TO 415.46. REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT IS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • FAULTY PROOF OF SERVICE FILED FOR RENEE DENISE DALE AND ALL OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less