This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/25/2020 at 03:55:07 (UTC).

RACHEL ELMOZNINO CLAUSIN VS ALEX CIUCIA

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 RACHEL ELMOZNINO CLAUSIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALEX CIUCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3533

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELMOZNINO CLAUSIN RACHEL

Defendant

CIUCIA ALEX

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/6/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/13/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Rachel Elmoznino Clausin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Rachel Elmoznino Clausin on 12/06/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Rachel Elmoznino Clausin as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Rachel Elmoznino Clausin (Plaintiff); As to: Alex Ciucia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less