Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2020 at 09:08:48 (UTC).

QUINN COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORP. VS WAIHNER ANTONIO CIFUENTES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 QUINN COMPANY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WAIHNER ANTONIO CIFUENTES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4077

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUINN COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP.

Defendants

CIFUENTES WAIHNER ANTONIO

CIFUENTES GEOVADY AYDE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POLICAR RAY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/5/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Complaint - Complaint

5/18/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/18/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/18/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Quinn Company, Inc., a California corp. on 05/18/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Quinn Company, Inc., a California corp. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Quinn Company, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Waihner Antonio Cifuentes (Defendant); Geovady Ayde Cifuentes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Quinn Company, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Waihner Antonio Cifuentes (Defendant); Geovady Ayde Cifuentes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Quinn Company, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Waihner Antonio Cifuentes (Defendant); Geovady Ayde Cifuentes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUINN COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORP., is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POLICAR RAY