Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 08:45:10 (UTC).

QUIK PICK EXPRESS LLC VS BUSINESS CAMERA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/08/2017 QUIK PICK EXPRESS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BUSINESS CAMERA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1384

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUIK PICK EXPRESS LLC

Defendants

LANDER PATRICK R.

BUSINESS CAMERA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERTS CAMERON WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Other - (name extension) - case summary

2/23/2018: Other - (name extension) - case summary

Declaration (name extension) - 585

2/23/2018: Declaration (name extension) - 585

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

2/23/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Judgment

2/23/2018: Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/26/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

1/11/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/22/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/22/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/17/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/17/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - on Complaint

9/8/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/8/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/8/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/8/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/08/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketOther - case summary; Filed by: Quik Pick Express LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff Quik Pick Express LLC against Defendant Patrick R. Lander and Defendant Business Camera Corporation on the Complaint filed by Quik Pick Express LLC on 09/08/2017 for damages of $8,870.45, interest of $758.16, and costs of $733.66 for a total of $10,362.27.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Quik Pick Express LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketDeclaration 585; Filed by: Quik Pick Express LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Quik Pick Express LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Docket; On the Complaint filed by Quik Pick Express LLC on 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to Patrick R. Lander; On the Complaint filed by Quik Pick Express LLC on 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Quik Pick Express LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Business Camera Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 181.83; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Quik Pick Express LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Patrick R. Lander (Defendant); Service Cost: 181.83; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Quik Pick Express LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Business Camera Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Quik Pick Express LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/08/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUICK PICK EXPRESS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERTS CAMERON WILLIAM