This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 15:56:17 (UTC).

QUANTUM LIFE VS MICHELLE WENDELL

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 QUANTUM LIFE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MICHELLE WENDELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAY A. SANTANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7580

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RAY A. SANTANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUANTUM LIFE COMP OF VANESSA LEE & NOA SADE DBA LIONETTE

301 W. 118Th Street, Apt#10H

New York, NY 10026

Defendant

WENDELL MICHELLE DBA CHIC LITTLE DEVIL

Los Angeles, CA 90015

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Settlement Agreement

3/6/2017: Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/16/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

12/16/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Minute Order of 03/06/2017

3/6/2017: Minute Order of 03/06/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

3/6/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

12/16/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 03/06/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 03/06/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1161221E7438 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1161221E7438 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: QUANTUM LIFE (Plaintiff); As to: Michelle Wendell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less