This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/26/2021 at 03:02:46 (UTC).

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP. VS IN RE: 123 W. 81ST STREET, LOS ANGELES, CA 90003

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP filed an Other lawsuit against IN RE 123 W 81ST STREET, LOS ANGELES, CA 90003. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2306

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP.

Respondent

IN RE: 123 W. 81ST STREET LOS ANGELES CA 90003

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PODMENIK MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...) of 02/24/2021

2/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...) of 02/24/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

2/24/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

12/9/2020: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

12/1/2020: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

11/25/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...) of 11/25/2020

11/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...) of 11/25/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...) of 11/23/2020

11/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...) of 11/23/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

11/23/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

Notice (name extension) - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/19/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/9/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

8/19/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Case Assignment

8/19/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Case Assignment

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/20/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds

7/20/2020: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

7/20/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2024
  • Hearing02/28/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Escheating of Funds scheduled for 02/28/2024 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...) of 02/24/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 02/24/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 02/24/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...) of 11/25/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 11/25/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/24/2021 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 11/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 11/23/2020 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Filed by: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner); As to: In Re: 123 W. 81ST STREET, LOS ANGELES, CA 90003 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 11/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketPetition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale; Filed by: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner); As to: In Re: 123 W. 81ST STREET, LOS ANGELES, CA 90003 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner); As to: In Re: 123 W. 81ST STREET, LOS ANGELES, CA 90003 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP02306    Hearing Date: November 25, 2020    Dept: 26

In Re: 123 W. 81st Street, et al

PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE’S SALE

(Civ. Code §§ 2924(c)-(d))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petition to Deposit Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee’s Sale and for Discharge of Liability is GRANTED EFFECTIVE UPON DEPOSIT OF SURPLUS FUNDS AND FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE NOTICE OF CLAIMS HEARING, AS ORDERED.

THE HEARING ON CLAIMS TO THE UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS FUNDS IS SET FOR FEBRUARY 24, 2021 AT ____ AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

ANALYSIS:

On July 20, 2020, Petitioner Quality Loan Service Corporation (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee’s Sale (the “Petition”). The gross amount of deposit is $5,887.00, without deducting attorney’s fees and expenses.

Having reviewed the Petition, the Court finds that it satisfies the requirements of Civil Code section 2924j with respect to the contents of the Trustee’s declaration, Trustee’s notice and service of written notice to all potential claimants to the surplus funds. Petitioner also asks for $2,957.94 in attorney’s fees and expenses and $225.00 in costs. (Pet., ¶16.)

In light of the foregoing, the Petition to Deposit Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee’s Sale and for Discharge of Liability is GRANTED EFFECTIVE UPON PETITIONER’S COMPLIANCE WITH THIS ORDER, AS FOLLOWS.

PETITIONER IS ORDERED TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS OF $2,704.06 WITH THE COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. PETITIONER IS FURTHER ORDERED TO GIVE NOTICE OF THE HEARING ON CLAIMS TO ALL POTENTIAL CLAIMANTS WITHIN 30 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

UPON DEPOSIT OF THE FUNDS TO THE COURT AND FILING OF THE PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE NOTICE OF DISBURSEMENT HEARING, PETITIONER SHALL BE DISCHARGED OF FURTHER RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE DISBURSEMENT OF SALE PROCEEDS. (CIVIL CODE, § 2924J, SUBD. (C).)

THE HEARING ON CLAIMS TO THE UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS IS SET FOR FEBRUARY 24, 2021 AT ____ AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. EACH CLAIMANT MUST FILE A WRITTEN CLAIM WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THIS ORDER; THE WRITTEN CLAIM SHOULD INCLUDE A DECLARATION SETTING FORTH THE BASIS FOR THE CLAIM OF OWNERSHIP OR INTEREST. (CIVIL CODE, § 2924J, SUBD. (D).) ALL CLAIMANTS MUST ALSO PERSONALLY APPEAR AT THE DISBURSEMENT HEARING. IF NO CLAIMS OR APPEARANCES ARE MADE, THE MATTER WILL BE SET FOR AN OSC RE: ESCHEATING FUNDS. (CODE CIV. PROC., § 128; GOVT. CODE, § 68084.1.)

Court clerk to give notice to all parties, claimants and interested parties.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IN RE: 6227 PALM AVENUE BELL CALIFORNIA 90201 is a litigant

Latest cases where Quality Loan Service Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Podmenik, Matthew