This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2021 at 04:42:37 (UTC).

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP. VS ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEE'S SALE

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP filed an Other lawsuit against ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEE'S SALE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3467

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP.

Respondent

ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEE'S SALE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PODMENIK MATTHEW E.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

5/4/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Claims to the Undistributed Surplus F...) of 06/30/2021

6/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Claims to the Undistributed Surplus F...) of 06/30/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Claims to the Undistributed Surplus F...)

6/30/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Claims to the Undistributed Surplus F...)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

3/4/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Clai...)

4/28/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Clai...)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Change of Address

1/26/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Change of Address

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Clai...) of 02/24/2021

2/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Clai...) of 02/24/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

2/24/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Clai...)

2/24/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Clai...)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Case Assignment

10/30/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Case Assignment

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

10/30/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Petition (name extension) - Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale

10/21/2020: Petition (name extension) - Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/21/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

10/21/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • Hearing10/27/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Escheating of Funds to the Clerk of the Superior Court of Los Angeles scheduled for 10/27/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Claims to the Undistributed Surplus F...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Claims to the Undistributed Surplus F...) of 06/30/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Claims to the Undistributed Surplus Funds scheduled for 06/30/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 06/30/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Claims to the Undistributed Surplus Funds scheduled for 06/30/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Clai...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 04/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 04/28/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; Filed by: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner); As to: All Claimants to Surplus Funds After Trustee's Sale (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Filed by: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 02/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketPetition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale; Filed by: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner); As to: All Claimants to Surplus Funds After Trustee's Sale (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner); As to: All Claimants to Surplus Funds After Trustee's Sale (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP03467    Hearing Date: April 28, 2021    Dept: 26

PROCEEDINGS: PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED
CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS
PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE’S SALE
MOVING PARTY: Petitioner Quality Loan Service Corporation
RESP. PARTY: None
PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND
DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE’S SALE
(Civ. Code §§ 2924(c)-(d))
TENTATIVE RULING:
Petition to Deposit Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee’s Sale and for Discharge of
Liability is GRANTED EFFECTIVE UPON DEPOSIT OF SURPLUS FUNDS AND FILING
OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE NOTICE OF CLAIMS HEARING, AS ORDERED.
THE HEARING ON CLAIMS TO THE UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS FUNDS IS SET FOR
JUNE 30, 2021 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET
COURTHOUSE.
ANALYSIS:
On October 21, 2020, Petitioner Quality Loan Service Corporation (“Petitioner”) filed the instant
Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus
Proceeds of Trustee’s Sale (the “Petition”) with respect to the real property located at 13452
Muscatine Avenue, Arleta, California. The Petition initially came for hearing on February 24,
2021 at which time potential claimant Laura Gomez appeared and asked for the opportunity to
file a claim. The Court continued the hearing to April 28, 2021, however, no claims have been
filed to date.
The gross amount of deposit is $26,453.27, without deducting attorney’s fees and expenses.
Having reviewed the Petition, the Court finds that it satisfies the requirements of Civil Code
section 2924j with respect to the contents of the Trustee’s declaration, Trustee’s notice and
service of written notice to all potential claimants to the surplus funds. Petitioner also asks for
$3,191.05 in attorney’s fees and expenses and $370.00 in costs. (Pet., ¶16.)
Based on the foregoing, the Petition to Deposit Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee’s Sale
and for Discharge of Liability is GRANTED EFFECTIVE UPON PETITIONER’S
COMPLIANCE WITH THIS ORDER, AS FOLLOWS.
PETITIONER IS ORDERED TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS OF $22,892.22 WITH THE
COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. PETITIONER IS FURTHER
ORDERED TO GIVE NOTICE OF THE HEARING ON CLAIMS TO ALL POTENTIAL
CLAIMANTS WITHIN 30 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.
UPON DEPOSIT OF THE FUNDS TO THE COURT AND FILING OF THE PROOF OF
SERVICE OF THE NOTICE OF DISBURSEMENT HEARING, PETITIONER SHALL BE
DISCHARGED FROM FURTHER RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE DISBURSEMENT OF
SALE PROCEEDS. (CIVIL CODE, § 2924J, SUBD. (C).)
THE HEARING ON CLAIMS TO THE UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS IS SET
FOR JUNE 30, 2021 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET
COURTHOUSE. EACH CLAIMANT MUST FILE A WRITTEN CLAIM WITHIN 30 DAYS
OF THIS ORDER; THE WRITTEN CLAIM SHALL INCLUDE A DECLARATION SETTING
FORTH THE BASIS FOR THE CLAIM OF OWNERSHIP OR INTEREST. (CIVIL CODE, §
2924J, SUBD. (D).) ALL CLAIMANTS MUST ALSO PERSONALLY APPEAR AT THE
DISBURSEMENT HEARING. IF NO CLAIMS OR APPEARANCES ARE MADE, THE
MATTER WILL BE SET FOR AN OSC RE: ESCHEATING FUNDS. (CODE CIV. PROC., §
128; GOVT. CODE, § 68084.1.)
Moving party to give notice to all parties, claimants and interested parties.

Case Number: 20STCP03467    Hearing Date: February 24, 2021    Dept: 26


Case Number: 20STLC01394    Hearing Date: February 24, 2021    Dept: 26

State Farm v. Guerra, et al.DEMURRER

(CCP §§ 430.31, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Cross-Defendant Camile Drayton’s Demurrer to the Cross-Complaint is OVERRULED. CROSS-DEFENDANT DRAYTON IS TO FILE AND SERVE AN ANSWER WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

On February 13, 2020, Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for automobile subrogation against Defendant Eymy Guerra (“Cross-Complainant”). On April 1, 2020, Cross-Complainant filed a Cross-Complaint against Camile Drayton (“Cross-Defendant Drayton”) and Kierra Lillie (“Cross-Defendant Lillie”) (collectively, “Cross-Defendants”) for indemnification and apportionment of fault.

Cross-Defendant Drayton filed the instant Demurrer to the Cross-Complaint on December 22, 2020. Cross-Complainant filed an opposition on February 9, 2021 and Cross-Defendant Drayton replied on February 10, 2021.

Discussion

The Court finds that the Motion is accompanied by a meet and confer declaration as required by Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41. (Motion, Magapian Decl., ¶¶4-5.) Cross-Defendant Drayton contends that Cross-Complainant fails to allege facts sufficient to support a cause of action. (Citing Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (e).) The Cross-Complaint alleges causes of action for indemnification and apportionment of fault against both Cross-Defendants.

1st Cause of Action for Indemnification

Although the Cross-Complaint does not specify the type of indemnification—express, implied or equitable—the allegations make it clear only the equitable kind is at issue. “A right of equitable indemnity can arise only if the prospective indemnitor (Cross-Defendant) and indemnitee (Cross-Complainant) are mutually liable to another person for the same injury.” (Fremont Reorganizing Corp. v. Faigin (2011) 198 Cal.App.4th 1153, 1177.) The Cross-Complaint sufficiently alleges that Cross-Complainant and Cross-Defendant Drayton are liable to Plaintiff from damages arising out of a motor vehicle accident. (Cross-Compl., ¶¶4-6.)

The argument on demurrer—that Plaintiff is only bringing this action as Cross-Defendant Drayton’s subrogee and simply stands in her shoes—is not supported by the Complaint. The Complaint is allegedly brought by Plaintiff as Cross-Defendant Lillie’s insurer. (Compl., ¶¶4-5.) Cross-Defendant Drayton is not mentioned anywhere in the Complaint nor is it alleged that Plaintiff is subrogated to Cross-Defendant Drayton’s rights.

Therefore, the demurrer to the first cause of action is OVERRULED.

2nd Cause of Action for Apportionment of Fault

Apportionment of fault similarly requires a separate party to whom the alleged joint-tortfeasors are liable. (Paragon Real Estate Group of San Francisco, Inc. v. Hansen (2009) 178 Cal.App.4th 177, 182.) As discussed above, the Cross-Complaint alleges that Cross-Complainant and Cross-Defendant Drayton are joint-tortfeasors with respect to Plaintiff’s damages.

The demurrer to the second cause of action is also overruled.

Conclusion

Cross-Defendant Camile Drayton’s Demurrer to the Cross-Complaint is OVERRULED. Cross-Defendant Drayton is to file and serve an Answer within 20 days’ service of this order.

Cross-Complainant to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quality Loan Service Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Podmenik, Matthew