This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2020 at 04:16:30 (UTC).

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP. VS ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP filed an Other lawsuit against ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2681

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Petitioner

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP.

Respondent

836-838 1/2 WEST 84TH ST LOS ANGELES CA 90044

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RAZI-JAFARI JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other to Determine the Disposition of Funds) of 08/24/2020

8/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other to Determine the Disposition of Funds) of 08/24/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other to Determine the Disposition of Funds)

8/24/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other to Determine the Disposition of Funds)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Hearing

5/28/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Hearing

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/5/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Hearing

4/22/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Hearing

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/16/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

12/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

12/18/2019: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Hearing

10/21/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Hearing

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/11/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/24/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

6/24/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds

6/24/2019: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/24/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

6/27/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Case Assignment

6/27/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Case Assignment

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • Hearing12/22/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Escheating of Funds scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing - Other to Determine the Disposition of Funds)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other to Determine the Disposition of Funds) of 08/24/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketHearing - Other to Determine the Disposition of Funds scheduled for 08/24/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 08/24/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance of Hearing; Filed by: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner); As to: 836-838 1/2 West 84th St, Los Angeles, CA 90044 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing - Other to Determine the Disposition of Funds scheduled for 06/09/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08/24/2020 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance of Hearing; Filed by: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner); As to: 836-838 1/2 West 84th St, Los Angeles, CA 90044 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketThere being no judge available this date, Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 10/28/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 12/18/2019 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 10/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNotice Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner); As to: 836-838 1/2 West 84th St, Los Angeles, CA 90044 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketPetition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale; Filed by: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner); As to: 836-838 1/2 West 84th St, Los Angeles, CA 90044 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner); As to: 836-838 1/2 West 84th St, Los Angeles, CA 90044 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCP02681    Hearing Date: August 24, 2020    Dept: 26

Quality Loan Service Corp. v. All Claimants, et al.

HEARING ON DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS

(CCP § 386)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Hearing on Disbursement of Funds is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. PER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 128 AND CAL. GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 68084.1 THE COURT SETS AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ESCHEATING OF FUNDS FOR FEBRUARY 22, 2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

ANALYSIS:

On June 24, 2019, Petitioner Quality Loan Service Corp. (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee’s Sale (the “Petition”) with respect to the real property located at 836-838 112 West 84th St, Los Angeles, California. There are surplus funds of $4,590.95 following the trustee’s sale. (Pet., ¶16h.)

On December 18, 2019, the Petition came for hearing and the Court ruled that Petitioner had satisfied all the requirements of Civil Code section 2924j. The Court ordered Petitioner to deposit the surplus funds of $4,590.95 within 10 days and give notice of the hearing on disbursement of funds. On December 18, 2019, Petitioner filed a Notice of Order and proof of service of the same. December 20, 2019, Petitioner deposited the surplus funds with the Court as ordered and therefore was discharged of further responsibility for the disbursement of sale proceeds. (Civ. Code, § 2924j, subd. (c).)

Court clerk to give notice to all Defendants, claimants and interested parties.

Case Number: 19STCP02681    Hearing Date: December 18, 2019    Dept: 94

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioner Quality Loan Services Corporation’s Petition Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee’s Sale is GRANTED. A HEARING TO DETERMINE THE DISPOSITION OF FUNDS IS SET FOR MARCH 18, 2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 94.

PETITIONER IS ORDERED TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS OF $4,590.95 WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER AND GIVE NOTICE OF THIS ORDER AND THE DISBURSEMENT HEARING ON ALL PARTIES, CLAIMANTS AND INTERESTED PARTIES.

ANALYSIS:

On June 24, 2019, Petitioner Quality Loan Service Corp. (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee’s Sale (the “Petition”) with respect to the real property located at 836-838 112 West 84th St, Los Angeles, California. There are surplus funds of $4,590.95 following the trustee’s sale. (Pet., ¶16h.) The Petition indicates that the following persons were provided notice of Petitioner’s intent to deposit the surplus funds: Yesenia Reyes Portillo, as the prior owner of the subject property; and Los Angeles Housing Department – Enforcement Services Section. (Pet., Attachment 11B, Exh. A.) The Petition also indicates that there is a junior lienholder associated with the subject property, Jose J. Padilla, but Petitioner has been unable to locate him despite the services of a private investigator. (Pet., Attachment 11B.)

The court finds the Petitioner has satisfied all the requirements of Civil Code section 2924j. Petitioner is to deposit the funds of $4,590.95 within 10 days’ notice of this order. A hearing to determine the disposition of funds is set for March 18, 2020 at 10:30 am in Department 94. Each claimant must file a written claim within 30 days of this order; the written claim should include a declaration setting forth the basis for the claim of ownership or interest. (Civil Code, § 2924j, subd. (d).) All claimants must also personally appear at the disbursement hearing. If no claims or appearances are made, the matter will be set for an OSC re: Escheating Funds. (Code Civ. Proc., § 128; Govt. Code, § 68084.1.)

Petitioner is ordered to give notice of this order and the disbursement hearing on all parties, claimants and interested parties. Upon deposit of the funds to the court and filing of the proof of service of the notice of disbursement hearing, Petitioner shall be discharged of further responsibility for the disbursement of sale proceeds. (Civil Code, § 2924j, subd. (c).)

Moving party to give notice to all Defendants, claimants and interested parties.