Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 19:52:33 (UTC).

QIAN LUO, ET AL. VS HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 QIAN LUO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2081

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WANG JUE

LUO QIAN

ZHOU JINGJUE

Defendants

HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC

BR WORKFORCE LLC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 05/20/2020 ; Status Date changed from 02/06/2020 to 05/20/2020 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 05/20/2020 ; Status Date changed from 05/20/2020 to 05/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 05/20/2020 ; Status Date changed from 05/20/2020 to 05/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 05/20/2020 ; Status Date changed from 05/20/2020 to 05/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 05/20/2020 ; Status Date changed from 05/20/2020 to 05/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 05/20/2020 ; Status Date changed from 05/20/2020 to 05/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Jingjue Zhou (Plaintiff); As to: BR Workforce, LLC. (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: QIAN LUO (Plaintiff); As to: BR Workforce, LLC. (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: JUE WANG (Plaintiff); As to: BR Workforce, LLC. (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: QIAN LUO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: QIAN LUO (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: QIAN LUO (Plaintiff); JUE WANG (Plaintiff); Jingjue Zhou (Plaintiff); As to: HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC (Defendant); Henry Aviles (Defendant); BR Workforce, LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC (Defendant), Henry Aviles (Defendant), BR Workforce, LLC. (Defendant) to BR Workforce, LLC. (Defendant), HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC (Defendant), Henry Aviles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: QIAN LUO (Plaintiff); JUE WANG (Plaintiff); Jingjue Zhou (Plaintiff); As to: HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC (Defendant); Henry Aviles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/24/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: QIAN LUO (Plaintiff); JUE WANG (Plaintiff); As to: HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC. is a litigant