This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/28/2020 at 01:39:39 (UTC).

QAMAR QURESHI VS REY SARARANA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 QAMAR QURESHI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against REY SARARANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9056

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QURESHI QAMAR

Defendants

SARARANA DOMINADOR

SARARANA REY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLIN STEVAN

Defendant Attorney

CAMPOS VICTOR M.

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice Of Taking Plaintiff's Counsel's Notice of Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel "Off Calendar"

9/29/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice Of Taking Plaintiff's Counsel's Notice of Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel "Off Calendar"

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

8/18/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/28/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

3/4/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

3/4/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Answer - Answer

12/11/2019: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/11/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

12/11/2019: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/19/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/19/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/1/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/1/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/1/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/1/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • Hearing10/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Hearing03/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice Of Taking Plaintiff's Counsel's Notice of Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel "Off Calendar"; Filed by: Qamar Qureshi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 10/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 09/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 08/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/26/2020 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Victor M. Campos (Attorney): First Name changed from VICTOR to Victor; Last Name changed from CAMPOS to Campos; Organization Name changed from LAW OFFICE OF ROBYN N. JONES-WILLIAMS to Law Office of Robyn N. Jones-Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketAddress for Victor M. Campos (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 06/17/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08/18/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Qamar Qureshi (Plaintiff); As to: Rey Sararana (Defendant); Service Date: 11/15/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Qamar Qureshi (Plaintiff); As to: Dominador Sararana (Defendant); Service Date: 11/15/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Qamar Qureshi (Plaintiff); As to: Rey Sararana (Defendant); Dominador Sararana (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Qamar Qureshi (Plaintiff); As to: Rey Sararana (Defendant); Dominador Sararana (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Qamar Qureshi (Plaintiff); As to: Rey Sararana (Defendant); Dominador Sararana (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC09056    Hearing Date: August 18, 2020    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE:   Tue., August 18, 2020 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Quereshi v. Sararana, et al. COMPL. FILED: 10-01-19

CASE NUMBER: 19STLC09056 DISC. C/O: 02-28-21

NOTICE:   NO DISC. MOT. C/O:    03-15-21

TRIAL DATE: 03-30-21

PROCEEDINGS    MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

MOVING PARTY:   Plaintiff’s Counsel Samuel Gabriel

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff’s Counsel Samuel Gabriel’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel is CONTINUED TO OCTOBER 26, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Plaintiff’s Counsel must file and serve supplemental papers addressing the deficiencies identified herein. Failure to do so may result in the Motion being placed off calendar or denied.  

SERVICE

[   ] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) NO

[   ] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) NO

[   ] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) NO

OPPOSITION: None filed as of August 14, 2020 [   ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of August 14, 2020 [   ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On October 1, 2019, Plaintiff Qamar Qureshi (“Plaintiff”) filed an action against Defendants Rey Sararana (“Rey”) and Dominador Sararana (“Dominador”) (collectively, “Defendants”) for negligence. On December 11, 2019, Defendants filed an Answer.

On March 4, 2020, Plaintiff’s Counsel Samuel E. Gabriel (“Counsel”) with the firm Gabriel & Associates filed the instant Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (the “Motion”). To date, no opposition has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard

(B) The service address is the last known residence or business address of the client and the attorney has been unable to locate a more current address after making reasonable efforts to do so within 30 days before the filing of the motion to be relieved.

  1. Discussion

Thus, the hearing is continued for proper service of the Motion and supporting papers.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff’s Counsel Samuel Gabriel’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel is CONTINUED TO OCTOBER 26, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Plaintiff’s Counsel must file and serve supplemental papers addressing the deficiencies identified herein. Failure to do so may result in the Motion being placed off calendar or denied.Moving party is ordered to give notice.