This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 09:56:20 (UTC).

PS-STERNS, INC. VS ATTACK MARKETING, LLC, AN OREGON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 PS-STERNS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ATTACK MARKETING, LLC, AN OREGON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4161

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PS-STERNS INC.

Defendant

ATTACK MARKETING LLC AN OREGON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRODKIN ALAN LEE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/31/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

5/10/2018: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Summons - on Complaint

2/9/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/9/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/9/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/9/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/9/2018: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: PS-Sterns, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Attack Marketing, LLC, an Oregon limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by PS-Sterns, INC. on 02/09/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by PS-Sterns, INC. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department B Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PS-Sterns, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Attack Marketing, LLC, an Oregon limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PS-Sterns, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATTACK MARKETING. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRODKIN ALAN