This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2020 at 13:37:05 (UTC).

PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES VS KELLY WISE

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KELLY WISE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0915

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES

Defendant

WISE KELLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHOLNICK ROBERT M

 

Court Documents

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

2/20/2020: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

2/20/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession of Real Property

2/20/2020: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession of Real Property

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/18/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/18/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/6/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

1/28/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Kelly Wise)

1/28/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Kelly Wise)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/24/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

1/24/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Complaint - Complaint

1/24/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession of Real Property; Issued by: Property Management Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Kelly Wise (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Property Management Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Kelly Wise (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Property Management Associates against Defendant Kelly Wise on the Complaint filed by Property Management Associates on 01/24/2020 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 822 S. Park View St., #204, Los Angeles, CA 90057 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Property Management Associates (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 41.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Property Management Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Property Management Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 01/28/2020; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Property Management Associates on 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Property Management Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Kelly Wise (Defendant); Service Date: 01/28/2020; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Kelly Wise; On the Complaint filed by Property Management Associates on 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Property Management Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Kelly Wise (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 91 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Property Management Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Kelly Wise (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Property Management Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Kelly Wise (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Property Management Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Kelly Wise (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOLNICK ROBERT MARTIN