This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 00:54:19 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE BUSINESS CORP. VS HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2018 PROGRESSIVE BUSINESS CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2028

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE BUSINESS CORP.

Defendant

HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISCHER RICHARD ALLAN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

4/30/2019: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/31/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

3/25/2019: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service

11/28/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/29/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/29/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/29/2018: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/29/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/29/2018: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by PROGRESSIVE BUSINESS CORP. on 10/29/2018, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by PROGRESSIVE BUSINESS CORP. as to HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: PROGRESSIVE BUSINESS CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: PROGRESSIVE BUSINESS CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: PROGRESSIVE BUSINESS CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service; Filed by: PROGRESSIVE BUSINESS CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PROGRESSIVE BUSINESS CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PROGRESSIVE BUSINESS CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive Business Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION - RICHARD A FISCHER