This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2016 at 09:13:19 (UTC).

PROFESSIONAL TAX APPEAL, INC. VS THORSON, JANE

Case Summary

On 05/07/2013 PROFESSIONAL TAX APPEAL, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THORSON, JANE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3944

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROFESSIONAL TAX APPEAL INC.

Defendant

THORSON JANE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2014
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (THORSON, JANE) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/10/13 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT 090 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC279625002. HEARING SET FOR 07/10/13 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROFESSIONAL TAX APPEAL is a litigant