This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2016 at 09:13:26 (UTC).

PROFESSIONAL TAX APPEAL, INC. VS NEMAN, ROBBIE

Case Summary

On 05/07/2013 PROFESSIONAL TAX APPEAL, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NEMAN, ROBBIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3946

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROFESSIONAL TAX APPEAL INC.

Defendants

NEMAN ROBBIE

KARA SAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2014
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT{S} AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION{S}.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED AS TO (NEMAN, ROBBIE) DUE TO UNDELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • NOTICE OF CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (NEMAN, ROBBIE) . RECEIPT # LAC487049020 . 7011 2000 0002 7708 1534

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC279625004. HEARING SET FOR 07/10/13 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROFESSIONAL TAX APPEAL is a litigant