This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2019 at 10:40:26 (UTC).

PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, RRG VS OKLAND CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA OKLAND CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2019 PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, RRG filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OKLAND CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA OKLAND CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT SCHUIT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1920

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RRG

Defendant

OKLAND CONSTRUCTION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA OKLAND CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HETTENA ALEXANDER V

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6/11/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/11/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/11/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

6/11/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/11/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/22/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/30/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/4/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, RRG on 06/11/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, RRG as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, RRG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F43 - Hon. Randy Rhodes; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, RRG (Plaintiff); As to: OKLAND CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA OKLAND CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to OKLAND CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA OKLAND CONSTRUCTION, INC. On the Complaint filed by PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, RRG on 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, RRG (Plaintiff); Service Cost: 79.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, RRG (Plaintiff); As to: OKLAND CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA OKLAND CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, RRG (Plaintiff); As to: OKLAND CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA OKLAND CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, RRG (Plaintiff); As to: OKLAND CONSTRUCTION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA OKLAND CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert Schuit in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OKLAND CONSTRUCTION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RRG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HETTENA ALEXANDER V