This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2019 at 03:33:29 (UTC).

PRIVATE EQUITY FUNDING, INC DBA VERTEX PACKAGING SUPPLIES VS WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 PRIVATE EQUITY FUNDING, INC DBA VERTEX PACKAGING SUPPLIES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4625

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRIVATE EQUITY FUNDING INC DBA VERTEX PACKAGING SUPPLIES

Defendants

EL BASRI JILALI

LOPEZ MARLON

WEST COAST DISTRIBUTION INC.

FRANCIA ALEX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAR MATT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/13/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/13/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/13/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

5/13/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Errata

5/15/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Errata

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/8/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketAddress for Matt Zar (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Private Equity Funding, Inc DBA Vertex Packaging Supplies on 05/13/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Private Equity Funding, Inc DBA Vertex Packaging Supplies as to Alex Francia, Jilali El Basri, Marlon Lopez, and West Coast Distribution, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Private Equity Funding, Inc DBA Vertex Packaging Supplies (Plaintiff); As to: West Coast Distribution, Inc. (Defendant); Jilali El Basri (Defendant); Alex Francia (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Errata; Filed by: Private Equity Funding, Inc DBA Vertex Packaging Supplies (Plaintiff); As to: West Coast Distribution, Inc. (Defendant); Jilali El Basri (Defendant); Alex Francia (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Private Equity Funding, Inc DBA Vertex Packaging Supplies (Plaintiff); As to: West Coast Distribution, Inc. (Defendant); Jilali El Basri (Defendant); Alex Francia (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Private Equity Funding, Inc DBA Vertex Packaging Supplies (Plaintiff); As to: West Coast Distribution, Inc. (Defendant); Jilali El Basri (Defendant); Alex Francia (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Private Equity Funding, Inc DBA Vertex Packaging Supplies (Plaintiff); As to: West Coast Distribution, Inc. (Defendant); Jilali El Basri (Defendant); Alex Francia (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Private Equity Funding, Inc DBA Vertex Packaging Supplies (Plaintiff); As to: West Coast Distribution, Inc. (Defendant); Jilali El Basri (Defendant); Alex Francia (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less