This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2019 at 01:45:09 (UTC).

PRICE, LILLIE VS SEVILLA, ARTURO

Case Summary

On 11/18/2015 PRICE, LILLIE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SEVILLA, ARTURO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL SMALL and JAY WOOLLACOTT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8199

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL SMALL

JAY WOOLLACOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRICE LILLIE

Defendants

SEVILLA ARTURO

SEVILLA ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/18/2015: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ($40.00)

12/10/2015: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ($40.00)

Minute Order

2/2/2016: Minute Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/4/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Appeal

2/17/2016: Notice of Appeal

Minute Order

4/26/2016: Minute Order

RETURNED MAIL

5/6/2016: RETURNED MAIL

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

6/30/2016: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption

9/16/2016: Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption

Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

9/26/2016: Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

Writ of Execution - (Orange)

9/28/2016: Writ of Execution - (Orange)

Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim

11/7/2016: Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim

Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption

11/16/2016: Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption

Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

12/6/2016: Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - By Arturo Sevilla

12/6/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - By Arturo Sevilla

Notice of Rejection

12/28/2016: Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - [Minute Order (Court Order)]

2/1/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Minute Order (Court Order)]

Minute Order - (Court Order)

2/1/2017: Minute Order - (Court Order)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • Writ - Return Partial satisfied ( Partially Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 468.00; Interest Credits: 1,424.18; Principal Credits: 4,139.30; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Writ - Return Partial Satisfied from Orange ( Partially Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 228.00; Interest Credits: 636.61; Principal Credits: 1,878.45; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (Orange): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Order Determining Claim Of Exemption AMENDED; Signed and Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Writ - Return returned from LASD wholly unsatisfied as to all parties; Filed by: Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 01/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Notice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2016
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY (SEVILLA, ARTURO) . RECEIPT # ALH427761011 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO ON 03/30/16 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPT. NE2 OF THE ALHAMBRA COURTHOUSE . CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (SEVILLA, ARTURO) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 03:39P M, IN DEPT. NE2 , HON. JAY WOOLLACOTT, JUDGE PRO TEMPORE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING BOTH PRESENT WITH SPANISH INTERPRETER MONICA BRINA, OATH ON FILE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • COURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • AFTER SUBMISSION, COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 02/02/16 . FOR (PRICE, LILLIE) . AGAINST (SEVILLA, ARTURO) . PRINCIPAL $ 10000.00 . COSTS $ 155.00 . TOTAL $ 10155.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. DEFENDANT ELIZABETH SEVILLA DOES NOT OWE PLAINTIFF ANY MONEY ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (SEVILLA, ARTURO) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/02/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NE2 . COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (SEVILLA, ELIZABETH) BY SUB-SERVING DEFT'S HUSBAND . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/02/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NE2 COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ALH256899050. HEARING SET FOR 02/02/16 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.