This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2016 at 11:02:55 (UTC).

PRESIDENTIAL VINEYARD-RANCH LL VS. MEJAMENA, YADIRAH

Case Summary

On 03/28/2014 PRESIDENTIAL VINEYARD-RANCH LL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MEJAMENA, YADIRAH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3237

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRESIDENTIAL VINEYARD-RANCH LLC

Defendant

MEJAMENA YADIRAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - VALERIE E. GILBERT ESQ

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2014
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED AS TO PRESIDENTIAL VINEYARD RANCH, LLC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 27.28 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # SM481473006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (PRESIDENTIAL VINEYARD-RANCH LLC) FOR REJECTION OF APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT - NO JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THIS CASE AS OF 5/9/14. SUBMITTED ON 05/06/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. H. JAY FORD III PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY VALERIE GILBERT,ESQ. . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING IN PRO PER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 05/01/14 , FOR (PRESIDENTIAL VINEYARD-RANCH LLC) , AGAINST (MEJAMENA, YADIRAH) , PAST DUE RENT $ 1074.00 , DAILY DAMAGES $ 818.50 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 500.00 , COSTS $ 340.00 . TOTAL $ 2,732.50 , AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 14634 BLYTHE ST. #5 PANORAMA CITY, CA 91402 , AND THIS JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46. NO FINAL LOCK-OUT PRIOR TO 5/16/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (MEJAMENA, YADIRAH) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (MEJAMENA, YADIRAH) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE ADDITIONAL COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT (MEJAMENA, YADIRAH) IS PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES: JURY FEES AND EXPENSES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • ANSWER FILED OF (MEJAMENA, YADIRAH) . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM519607009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 09/24/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE H. JAY FORD III .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRESIDENTIAL VINEYARD-RANCH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ATTORNEY AT LAW - VALERIE E. GILBERT