Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2021 at 06:11:28 (UTC).

PREMIER MEAT COMPANY VS SHORELINE CELLARS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 PREMIER MEAT COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHORELINE CELLARS INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1575

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PREMIER MEAT COMPANY

Defendants

DE MARTIMPREY STEPHAN AN INDIVIDUAL

SHORELINE CELLARS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA WATERS EDGE WINERY OF LONG BEACH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRODKIN ALAN

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - in Full

3/4/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - in Full

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/19/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/19/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

11/19/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/19/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Pursuant to C.C.P. 1033(b)

11/19/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Pursuant to C.C.P. 1033(b)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Attorney Fees

11/19/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Attorney Fees

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

11/19/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Pre-Judgment Interest

11/19/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Pre-Judgment Interest

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/19/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

12/1/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/8/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

9/8/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/8/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/8/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - in Full; Filed by: PREMIER MEAT COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SHORELINE CELLARS INC., a California corporation (Defendant); STEPHAN DE MARTIMPREY, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Norwalk Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Andrew C. Kim; Reason: Transfer for Reassignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - in Full: Filed By: PREMIER MEAT COMPANY (Plaintiff); Result: Entered; Result Date: 03/04/2021; As To Parties changed from SHORELINE CELLARS INC., a California corporation (Defendant), STEPHAN DE MARTIMPREY, an individual (Defendant) to SHORELINE CELLARS INC., a California corporation (Defendant), STEPHAN DE MARTIMPREY, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 03/04/2021 ; Status Date changed from 12/01/2020 to 03/04/2021 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 03/04/2021 ; Status Date changed from 03/04/2021 to 03/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff PREMIER MEAT COMPANY against Defendant STEPHAN DE MARTIMPREY, an individual and Defendant SHORELINE CELLARS INC., a California corporation DBA WATERS EDGE WINERY OF LONG BEACH on the Complaint filed by PREMIER MEAT COMPANY on 09/08/2020 for the principal amount of $4,045.07, attorney fees of $332.70, interest of $393.42, and costs of $305.00 for a total of $5,076.19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Status Date changed from 11/19/2020 to 12/01/2020; As To Parties changed from STEPHAN DE MARTIMPREY, an individual (Defendant), SHORELINE CELLARS INC., a California corporation (Defendant) to STEPHAN DE MARTIMPREY, an individual (Defendant), SHORELINE CELLARS INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: PREMIER MEAT COMPANY (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 12/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: PREMIER MEAT COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: STEPHAN DE MARTIMPREY, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: PREMIER MEAT COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SHORELINE CELLARS INC., a California corporation (Defendant); STEPHAN DE MARTIMPREY, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: PREMIER MEAT COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: STEPHAN DE MARTIMPREY, an individual (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/17/2020; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PREMIER MEAT COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SHORELINE CELLARS INC., a California corporation (Defendant); STEPHAN DE MARTIMPREY, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PREMIER MEAT COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SHORELINE CELLARS INC., a California corporation (Defendant); STEPHAN DE MARTIMPREY, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PREMIER MEAT COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: SHORELINE CELLARS INC., a California corporation (Defendant); STEPHAN DE MARTIMPREY, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PREMIER MEAT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRODKIN ALAN