This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2019 at 00:02:00 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS MONTFORD, KEN

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MONTFORD, KEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL P RAMIREZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8400

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL P RAMIREZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

MONTFORD KEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUNT AND HENRIQUES - ANDREA WATKINS

Attorney at HUNT AND HENRIQUES

WATKINS ANDREA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. SASE. MG . RECEIPT # NOR636672010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 05/22/17 . FOR (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) . AGAINST (MONTFORD, KEN) . PRINCIPAL $ 2307.97 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 . INTEREST $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 284.00 . TOTAL $ 2,591.97 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RESEARCH ATTORNEY RE: 1788 COURT JUDGMENT REVIEW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (MONTFORD, KEN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MONTFORD, KEN) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: SEC. 1033 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 1788.60(A) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MONTFORD, KEN) SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH LOURDES DOE ON 01/03/16 . COSTS OF $ 59.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 11/30/18 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEY . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY DANIEL P RAMIREZ, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455965041. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less