This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2019 at 21:14:48 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS GALSTYAN, NARINE

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GALSTYAN, NARINE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN NICHOLSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8297

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN NICHOLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

GALSTYAN NARINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEYS AT LAW - ANDREA S WATKINS

Attorney at HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEYS AT LAW

WATKINS ANDREA S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC) FOR REJECTION OF COURT JUDGMENT-SUBMIT A SWORN DECLARATION BY ONE WITH PERSONAL KNOWLEDGE TO AUTHENTICATE THE BUSINESS RECORDS SUBMITTED BY THE DEBT BUYER TO ESTABLISH THE FACTS REQUIRED TO BE ALLEGED BY CIVIL CODE SECTION 1788.58(A)(3-8). SUBMITTED ON 05/12/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO JUDGES CHAMBERS RE: COURT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE RETAINED BY COURT JUDGMENT DESK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: INTEREST, COSTS AND ATTORNEY FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (GALSTYAN, NARINE) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (GALSTYAN, NARINE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO SHELF 1 RE: FILE REVIEWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 12/03/18 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY JOHN NICHOLSON, JUDGE PRO TEM TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA622972010. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less