Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2020 at 16:52:21 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS SHUSHANIK MESROPYAN

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHUSHANIK MESROPYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT SCHUIT. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1394

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

MESROPYAN SHUSHANIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOK JORDAN DAVID

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/30/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

3/27/2020: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Complaint - Complaint

3/18/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/18/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/18/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC on 03/18/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SHUSHANIK MESROPYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SHUSHANIK MESROPYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SHUSHANIK MESROPYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SHUSHANIK MESROPYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert Schuit in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less