This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/05/2020 at 09:20:17 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS SHEREE ALEXANDER

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHEREE ALEXANDER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7100

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

ALEXANDER SHEREE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIPIERO ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/5/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/24/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

12/5/2019: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • Hearing12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SHEREE ALEXANDER (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/24/2019; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SHEREE ALEXANDER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SHEREE ALEXANDER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SHEREE ALEXANDER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SHEREE ALEXANDER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.