This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2020 at 06:05:11 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS SHAZELLE CABRERA

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHAZELLE CABRERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7391

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

CABRERA SHAZELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIPIERO ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

12/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/5/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

12/5/2019: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/24/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/31/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 12/05/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SHAZELLE CABRERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SHAZELLE CABRERA (Defendant); Service Date: 12/27/2019; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SHAZELLE CABRERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SHAZELLE CABRERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SHAZELLE CABRERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SHAZELLE CABRERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less