Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 08:08:58 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS SEAN N MACKAY

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SEAN N MACKAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2975

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

MACKAY SEAN N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VILLARREAL REGINALDO

Defendant Attorney

HOLLANDER-URBACH ADAM

 

Court Documents

General Denial - General Denial

3/12/2021: General Denial - General Denial

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

3/12/2021: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

12/28/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

12/28/2020: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/28/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/28/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • Hearing01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: SEAN N MACKAY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SEAN N MACKAY (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/22/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SEAN N MACKAY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SEAN N MACKAY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SEAN N MACKAY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SEAN N MACKAY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VILLARREAL REGINALDO