Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 08:34:43 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS ROSEMARY ESKRIDGEEVRENOS

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROSEMARY ESKRIDGEEVRENOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICK BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4557

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICK BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

ESKRIDGEEVRENOS ROSEMARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS EMILY BLAKE

 

Court Documents

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

4/19/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Proof of Service - No Service

12/11/2017: Proof of Service - No Service

Complaint

11/13/2017: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

1/9/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Judgment

5/29/2018: Judgment

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/13/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/19/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Summons - on Complaint

11/13/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

5/29/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/13/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Declaration (name extension) - of Counsel re: Interest; Costs CCP 1033; Attorney Fees

4/19/2018: Declaration (name extension) - of Counsel re: Interest; Costs CCP 1033; Attorney Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2018
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Abstract - Request; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC against Defendant ROSEMARY ESKRIDGEEVRENOS on the Complaint filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC on 11/13/2017 for the principal amount of $5,902.33 and costs of $284.50 for a total of $6,186.83.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to Civ. Code Sec. 1788.60(b); Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Declaration of Counsel re: Interest; Costs CCP 1033; Attorney Fees; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: ROSEMARY ESKRIDGEEVRENOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Default entered as to ROSEMARY ESKRIDGEEVRENOS; On the Complaint filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC on 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: ROSEMARY ESKRIDGEEVRENOS (Defendant); Service Date: 01/07/2018; Service Cost: 59.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Rick Brown in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: ROSEMARY ESKRIDGEEVRENOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less